Hubbard v. Phil's BBQ of Point Loma, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Hubbard
Defendant: Phil's BBQ of Point Loma, Inc., Phillip C. Pace and Jeffrey A. Loya
Case Number: 3:2009cv00735
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Stockholders Suits Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 187 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court AWARDS Hubbard $205,153 in attorney's fees plus $12,714.26 in costs with regard to his consulting agreement claim in this case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/20/13. (kaj)
May 1, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Following Bench Trial, Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration 176 , and Order for Entry of Judgement. The Court finds for Plaintiff and against Defendant on Plaintiff's first claim f or relief, and awards him $41,666.65 plus 10% prejudgment interest. His motion for partial reconsideration is GRANTED and Phil's is ORDERED to pay him $87,797.00. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for Plaintiff and against Defendants. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/1/13. (kaj)
December 14, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Renewed Motion to File Documents Under Seal, granting in part and denying in part defedants' 127 , 128 Motions to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pace and Loya are dismissed as parties. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/14/12. (kaj)
October 16, 2012 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice motion to file declaration under seal. No later than noon on Friday, October 19, 2012, Pace and Loya may renew their application, which must be filed in the docket. The Court will retain the lodged materials, however, and they need not refile those. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/16/12.(kaj)
March 27, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER valuing shares of Phil's BBQ of Point Loma, Inc; and Order Denying as moot 108 Motion for Status Conference; and Order of Dismissal. The Court has determined that Hubbard owns 10% of Phil's, and that Pace and Loya own the othe r 90%, and that Phil's should be valued as a going concern if possible. The Court therefore directs the parties to use the 30-day simultaneous protocol as discussed at the valuation hearing. A cashier's check in the amount identified b y the appraisers is to be delivered to Hubbard's counsel within thirty calendar days of the date this order is issued. Hubbard is simultaneously to deliver his shares with the assignment executed in blank. Having adjudicated all claims, the Court Dismisses this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/23/12. (lao)
August 4, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 motion to certify an interlocutory appeal and for stay of proceedings; denying 100 ex parte application for leave to seek reconsideration is denied; the parties are directed to prepare diligently for the evidentiary hearing on September 16, 2010 at 10:00am. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/2/10. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Phil's BBQ of Point Loma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hubbard
Represented By: Benjamin H. Kaminash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil's BBQ of Point Loma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip C. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Loya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?