Threats v. Sisto et al

Petitioner: Marcus E Threats
Respondent: D K Sisto and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv00816
Filed: April 15, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 Report and Recommendations. Court adopts Magistrate Judge Battaglia's well-reasoned Report and Recommendation in its entirety and denies the First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/3/32010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jcj).
January 5, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 First Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus recommending that Court issue an Order: 1.) approving and adopting the Report and Recommendation, and 2) directing that Judgment be entered denying the Petition and dismissing this case. Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2010. Replies due by 2/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/5/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (jrl).
June 29, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Substituting Respondent. Court sua sponte orders Matthew Cate, Secretary substituted as respondent in place of D.K. Sisto and J.W Haviland. Matthew Cate rep by Ronald Alan Jakob added. J W Haviland and D K Sisto terminated. Clerk shall modify docket to reflect Matthew Cate, Secretary as respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/29/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).
April 27, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Court dismisses case w/o prejudice and w/ leave to amend for Petitioner's failure to satisfy the filing fee requirement and name a proper respondent. If Petitioner wishes to proceed w/ case, he must submit by 6/30/3009, th e $5.00 fee w/ a copy of this Order or w/ adequate proof of inability to pay the fee, and a First Amended Petition naming a proper respondent. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/27/2009. Blank IFP Motion and blank First Amended Petition forms t/w copy of this Order mailed to Petitioner. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Threats v. Sisto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus E Threats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D K Sisto
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?