Lowry v. Metropolitan Transit System Board et al

Plaintiff: Daryl Lowry
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit System Board, Heritage Security, Joseph Torrence and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv00898
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting the 123 Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying 110 Motion for Sanctions insofar as the motion seeks costs; Dismisses with prejudice case number 09cv0898 as to Defendant MTS and Defendant Joseph. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/5/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 26, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 78 the Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge and Granting the Motions to Dismiss by defendants Heritage Security Services and Jerrod Gressett. The Court Adopts the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge, Dismisses with prejudice the actions as to Defendant Heritage. The Court Denies the 65 Motion for sanctions insofar as the motions seek costs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/26/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
March 12, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/12/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
March 25, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Discovery Hearing. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to immediately cease and desist all threatening behavior and foul, abusive, or assaultive language towards defense counsel. The Court further orders that all of Plaintiff's future co mmunications with Defendants and their counsel be in written form. Plaintiff may no longer communicate with Defendants or their counsel over the telephone for any reason. The Court hereby further places Plaintiff on written notice that sanctions, including dismissal of his lawsuit, may be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/25/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
June 10, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part MTS's 27 motion to dismiss. The Court denies Heritage's 28 motion to dismiss in its entirety. MTS's and Heritage's motions for a more definite statement are also denied. MTS and Heritage must file their answers within ten days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/8/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry v. Metropolitan Transit System Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit System Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?