Norris-Wilson et al v. Delta-T Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vonda Norris-Wilson and Abigail Papa
Defendant: Delta-T Group, Inc., Delta-T Group San Diego, Inc. and Delta-T Group Los Angeles, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00916
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement 113 , Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Fees, Costs and Expenses 114 , Dismissal of Delta-T Group, Inc. 109 , and Final Order of Judgment. The Parties' Joint Motion for Final Ap proval of Class Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Fees, Costs & Expenses are granted. The Court approves the proposed Settlement Agreement in its entirety. The Court hereby approves of Defendants' payment of the Gross Settleme nt Amount of $594,000 in connection with this settlement.The Court approves of the notice of class action and settlement distribution by Class Counsel to class members. Defendants Delta-T Group San Diego, Inc. and Delta-T Group Los Angeles, Inc. are hereby ordered to submit to Class Counsel checks made out to each individual class member, along with a check made payable to Class Counsel in the amount of ordered attorneys' fees and litigation costs, within ten (10) business days after t he Settlement Effective Date. The Court hereby dismisses on the merits and with prejudice the Complaint removed to this Court, styled Norris-Wilson, et al. v. Delta-T Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 09CV0916 LAB (RBB). The Parties Joint Motion to Dismi ss Defendant Delta-T Group, Inc. is hereby granted, and the Court hereby strikes Delta-T Group, Inc. from the caption of this lawsuit. It is hereby ordered that the Magistrate Judge shall retain jurisdiction over all disputes between and among the Parties arising out of the settlement agreement, including but not limited to interpretation and enforcement of the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/25/12. (kaj)
December 13, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Plaintiffs' motions to modify the class definition and enforce the settlement are denied. The parties should contact Judge Brooks' chambers to schedule settlement talks within 7 days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/9/11. (kaj)
September 30, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Cross-Motions for Class Certification; denying in part DTG's 34 Motion to Deny Class Certification; granting plaintiffs' 36 Motion for Class Certification; denying without prejudice DTG's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; the parties must jointly submit a proposal on scheduling summary judgment motions within 7 days of the date this order is entered; the Court adopts Plaintiffs' class definition and DEFINES the class as follows: All persons who currently work or have worked in California for Defendant(s) as healthcare workers from March 10, 2005 to the present, and are/were classified as independent contractors by Defendant(s); the named Plaintiffs, Norris-Wilson and Papa, will serve as the class representat ives; the Court also believes that the law firm of Nichols Kaster can litigate this case competently,and it APPOINTS Rebekah Bailey, Michele Fisher, and Paul Lukas lead counsel; the parties should jointly submit a proposed notice within 14 days of the date this order is entered; if the parties can't agree on a proposed notice, the parties should each submit their own, with a very short accompanying brief, within 21 days; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/29/10. (kaj)
June 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendants' 56 Ex Parte Application for Permission to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief: Defendants' reply brief is received. Bamgbose is not irrelevant, but neither is the Court bound to follow it. The parties can expect an order on the ultimate class certification to be forthcoming. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/28/10. (pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris-Wilson et al v. Delta-T Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonda Norris-Wilson
Represented By: Rebekah L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Papa
Represented By: Rebekah L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta-T Group, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta-T Group San Diego, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta-T Group Los Angeles, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?