Gurvey v. Legend Films, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Amy R. Gurvey
Defendant: Legend Films, Inc., Jeffrey B. Yapp, David G. Martin and Barry B. Sandrew
Case Number: 3:2009cv00942
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 198 Motion to Vacate Sanctions and Request for Replevin. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/3/13. (cge)
February 27, 2013 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting Plaintiff's 191 Request for an Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Rule 11 Motion; (2) denying Plaintiff's Request to file Cross-Motion under Rules 11 and 37; and (3) denying Plaintiff's 192 Motion to Reconstruct Record.(Responses due by 3/21/2013, replies due by 4/5/2013 as to 189 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Amy R. Gurvey). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/27/13. (cge)
January 22, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 180 Motion to Vacate Rule 60(b) (2)(3)(5)(6). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/22/13. (cge)
September 14, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiffs Ex Parte Applications, [Doc. Nos. 148 and 149],Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 118], DenyingPlaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 132], Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate, Transfer to SDNY for Trial, and for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Documents, [Doc. No. 157], Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Preliminary Pre-Trial Memo and Witness Lists, [Doc. No. 161]. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/14/12. (cge)
January 27, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 139 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration. Court finds that the Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate that Magistrate Judge Skomals October 3, 2011 Order was clearly erroneous or contrary to law, and as such, the Plaintiffs objection, Doc. No. 139, is hereby overruled. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/27/12.(cge)
October 3, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 116 Motion to Disqualify Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal; denying 116 Motion for six weeks to retain new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 09/30/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 29, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting Defendants' 99 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Expert Designation; (2) granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 103 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Discovery; (3) denying as moot Plaintiff's 112 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, and for an Order for an Expedited Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 07/29/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 15, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 107 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Hearing and to Disqualify Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 07/15/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 12, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the law firms of Squitieri & Fearon LLP and Wexler Wallace LLP's 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Court gives Plaintiff 30 days from the filing of this Order to obtain a new counsel or be prepared to proceed pro se. Attorneys Mark J Tamblyn; Olimpio Lee Squitieri and Garry T. Stevens terminated. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/12/2010. (jah)
January 4, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss. Dfts' motion to dismiss Pla's first and second causes of action is granted. Court dismisses w/o leave to amend the first and second causes of action in their entirety. Dft's motion to dismiss Pla's third, fourth, fifth, sixth and seventh causes of action w/ respect to Dfts Legend, Sandrew, and Yapp is denied. Dfts' motion to dismiss Pla's fifth and sixth causes of action w/ respect to Dft Martin is granted. Court dismisses w/o leave to amend the fifth and sixth causes of action as to Dft Martin. Court dismisses Dft Martin from the case, because all of Pla's causes of action against Dft Martin were dismissed. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/4/2010. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurvey v. Legend Films, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy R. Gurvey
Represented By: Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Films, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Terrance Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Yapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Martin
Represented By: Michael Terrance Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry B. Sandrew
Represented By: Michael Terrance Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?