Academy of Our Lady of Peace v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Academy of Our Lady of Peace
Defendant: City of San Diego, City Council of the City of San Diego and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv00962
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 169 Joint MOTION for Discovery Determination of Discovery Dispute on Supplementing Administrative Record. For the reasons expressed herein, Plaintiff's motion to supplement the administrative record is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/27/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 28, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute - Requests for Production, Attorney-Client Privilege and Deliberative Process Privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/28/11. (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 14, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 112 ) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Writ of Mandate Claim is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/14/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also was mailed to Atty Daniel O. Cortez.) (mdc)
April 1, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 17 ) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. Plaintiff's (Doc. 25 ) Motion for Permanent Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/1/2010. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Academy of Our Lady of Peace v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy of Our Lady of Peace
Represented By: Richard Alan Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of the City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?