Golez v. Potter et al

Plaintiff: Wilfredo A Golez
Defendant: John E Potter and US Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2009cv00965
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION FOLLOWING TRIAL AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. The Court enters judgment for Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/31/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 11, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 138 Request for Leave to File an Amended Motion for Reconsideration; Denying Plaintiff's 141 Amended Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 04/11/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
February 3, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the remaining FMLA claim. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/31/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
November 29, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion to Compel. The Court has found Plaintiffs Motion to Compel suitable for decision without oral argument. The teleconference on Plaintiffs motion to compel currently scheduled for December 8, 2011 at 4:30 p.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/29/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
October 17, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Title VII and rehabilitation claims; and as to the FMLA claim re any events prior to May 5, 2006. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/14/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
July 21, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 102 Motion for Leave of Court to Allow Subpoena. Plaintiff's Motion is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's request for subpoena form is granted. Plaintiff's request for Court's assistance in locating witness Michael Boisvert is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 07/21/11. (Forms mailed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (jrl).
August 23, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for a TRO without prejudice. The 60 Motion for Leave to File a TRO is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 12, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 42 Motion to Strike; Granting In Part and Denying In Part 52 Motion to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted limited leave to amend his complaint to add a claim under § 501 of th e Rehabilitation Act. Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint must be filed within 25 days of the filing of this order. If Plaintiff does not file a Fourth Amended Complaint, Defendant shall answer the TAC within 45 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/12/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golez v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo A Golez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Potter
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Service
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?