Hayes v. Dovey et al

Plaintiff: Dontay D Hayes
Defendant: John Dovey, Jeanne Woodford, J G Giurbino, M E Bourland, G J Janda and Wendy Still
Case Number: 3:2009cv01016
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 79 Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(c). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 28, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re: 45 Motion to Dismiss, 49 Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby grants Defendant Tilton's Motion to Dismiss for failure to state an Eighth Amendment claim. The C ourt denies Defendants Bourland and Janda's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims against them for failing to state a claim. The Court denies Defendants Bourland, Janda, Giurbino and Woodford's Motion to Dismiss based o n qualified immunity. It is further ordered that Defendants Bourland, Janda, Giurbino and Woodford shall file an answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within the time provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/28/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
April 22, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.12(b)(6) re 16 , 23 . The Court hereby Grants Defendants Still, Dovey and Woodford's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff� 39;s Eighth Amendment claims against them for failing to state a claim. The Court grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave from the date this Order is filed to either: (1) file and serve upon Defendants a First Amended Complaint which addresses ea ch deficiency of pleading identified in this Order; or (2) notify the Court and Defendants that he intends to proceed with this action as to the Eighth Amendment claims against Giurbino, Janda and Bourland only. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/22/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Dovey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontay D Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dovey
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J G Giurbino
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Bourland
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Still
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?