Dawkins v. Woodford et al

Plaintiff: Anthony D Dawkins
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford, T Ochoa, C Butler, R Gower, D Gonzales, G Siota, Stratton, M P Duran, B. Ries, Smith, Ramirez, L C Moschetti, B Barker, M Trujillo, Villa, Allen, B Guevara, Nancy Mejia, Edgar Ibarra and R Harmon
Case Number: 3:2009cv01053
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting 174 Report and Recommendation; and (2) Granting 151 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. Having reviewed the R&R, the Court finds that it is thorough, well reasoned, and contains no clear error. Acco rdingly, the Court adopts Magistrate Judge Bartick's R&R in its entirety and grants the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant G. Siota are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/7/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
February 21, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING in part and declining to adopt in part 120 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and (2) granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss: The Court DECLINES TO ADOPT the R&R as to Defendants' motion to dismiss claim three ; Defendants' motion to dismiss claim three is therefore DENIED. The Court ADOPTS the R&R in all other respects, and ORDERS the following: (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss claim one is GRANTED; (2) Defendants' motion to dismiss cla im five is DENIED; (3) Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amendment claim against Defendants Mejia and Ibarra is DENIED; (4) Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's due process claim against Defendant Duran is DE NIED; (5) Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's request for declaratory relief is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (6) Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief against employees at Calipatria State Prison is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/21/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
September 8, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing re 107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint: On or before 10/5/11, Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief. On or before 10/12/11, Defendants shall file a Reply, if any, to Plaintiff's supplemental brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/8/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
March 14, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) ADOPTING 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; (2) granting 56 60 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss: Plaintiff's first, third, fifth, and sixth causes of action are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's requests for declarator y and injunctive relief are denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Any amended complaint shall be filed within 21 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed. If no amended complaint is received by that time, the Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/14/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawkins v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Dawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Butler
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Gower
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Gonzales
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Siota
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M P Duran
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ries
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L C Moschetti
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Barker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Trujillo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Guevara
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Mejia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Ibarra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Harmon
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?