Yendes v. McCulloch et al

Plaintiff: Albert E. Yendes, Jr.
Defendant: Marc McCulloch, Troy Ribail, Four Unknown Named Special Agents of the FBI, Unknown Named Task Force Agent, Unknown Named FBI Special Agent in Charge, Unknown Named FBI Assistant Special Agent in Charge, Unknown Named U.S. Attorney and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01143
Filed: May 27, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying plaintiffs' motion to strike and granting defendants' 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
August 23, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 22 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: If Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so no later than September 7, 2010. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint, if any, within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
November 9, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases, Denying 13 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot and Vacating Hearing Dates: All further filings shall be made in case no. 09cv1143 only. No later than November 23, 2009 Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint. Plaintiffs respective proposed amended complaints shall be merged and filed as the consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/9/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yendes v. McCulloch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert E. Yendes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc McCulloch
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Ribail
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Unknown Named Special Agents of the FBI
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Task Force Agent
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named FBI Special Agent in Charge
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named FBI Assistant Special Agent in Charge
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named U.S. Attorney
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?