SLR Partners, LLC et al v. B. Braun Medical Inc

Plaintiff: SLR Partners, LLC and Rozi Medical Devices Limited
Defendant: B. Braun Medical Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv01145
Filed: May 27, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/20/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
October 26, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - defendant's motion to dismiss is granted. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
September 14, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to file under seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/14/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).
September 10, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to file under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79-2. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLR Partners, LLC et al v. B. Braun Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLR Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Hangartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozi Medical Devices Limited
Represented By: Jonathan Hangartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Braun Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?