Barba de la Torre et al v. Icenhower et al

Plaintiff: Martha Margarita Barba de la Torre and Alejandro Diaz
Defendant: Jerry L Icenhower, Donna Lee Icenhower, Hobart Icenhower, Jerry Lee Icenhower, Howell & Gardner Investors, Inc., Icenhower Investments, Western Financial Assets, Inc., Buckeye International Funding, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01161
Filed: May 29, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Louisa S. Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Martha Margarita Barba de la Torre and Plaintiff Alejandro Diaz shall have judgment against Defendant Mary Suzanne Icenhower and Brian S. Icenhower, Trustees of the Hobert Gerald Icenhower and Mary Suzanne Icenhower Revocable Trust Dated September 19, 2007; and Brian S. Icenhower, Executor of the Estate of Hobert Gerald Icenhower in the total amount of $1,265,230. It is further Ordered that said Counter claimants tak e nothing by virtue of their counterclaim on file herein. Plaintiffs claims against the defendants other than Mary Suzanne Icenhower and Brian S. Icenhower, Trustees of the Hobert Gerald Icenhower and Mary Suzanne Icenhower Revocable Trust Dated September 19, 2007, and Brian S. Icenhower, Executor of the Estate of Hobert Gerald Icenhower, shall be dismissed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
August 18, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 89 Motion to Extend Litigation Dates and Denying 94 Motion Requesting a Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
February 9, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/9/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 22, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 55 Motion to Dismiss and 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. The case will move forward, and the parties are precluded from filing a motion to reconsider this order. Only Jerry and Dona Icenhower have answered the TAC, and all other Defendants must file their answers within twenty-one days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/22/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
February 17, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' ex parte application to continue the telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference 38 and VACATES the ENE scheduled for February 24, 2010. The Court will conduct a telephonic, attorneys-only Case Management Conference on May 24, 2010 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/17/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
October 28, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a second amended complaint. Any amended complaint must be filed within 15 days of the filing of this order. Defendant shall file an answer within 35 days of filing of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barba de la Torre et al v. Icenhower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Margarita Barba de la Torre
Represented By: D Anthony Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Diaz
Represented By: D Anthony Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Lee Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Lee Icenhower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell & Gardner Investors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icenhower Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Financial Assets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye International Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?