Harding v. Time Warner, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sean Harding
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01212
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Time Warner, Inc. against Sean Harding. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the First Amended Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice.(lao) (av1).
October 21, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 14 ) is granted. No later than 20 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint, attached to the Motion for Leave to Amend as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/21/2009. (mdc) (jrl).
August 18, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss is granted (Doc. 6 ). The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. No later than twenty days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the Complaint, accompanied by a proposed amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a motion for leave to amend within twenty days, the Court will order this case to be closed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/18/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding v. Time Warner, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Harding
Represented By: Jason Nienberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?