Contreras v. Vazquez et al

Plaintiff: Rocky Mel Contreras
Defendant: Omar Vazquez and USCG Sector San Diego
Case Number: 3:2009cv01267
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Tulare
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Action is dismissed w/ prejudice pursuant to the parties' stipulation. All pending motions are denied as moot. Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/10/2010. Case is closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah) (av1).
February 2, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 32 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court construes Pla's document 36 as a motion to amend and grants Pla leave to file second amended complaint. Cle rk directed to file Pla's Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to Pla's 36 Table of Contents for Exhibit of 2nd Amended Complaint. Pla is cautioned that absent exceptional circumstances, no additional leave to amend will be granted until Court can consider the Second Amended Complaint on its merits. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/2/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)(jrl).
August 6, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Denying w/o prejudice as moot 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Pla directed to pay filing fee w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Pla cautioned that failure to pay filing fee will result in dismissal of the action. Pla may renew motion for appointment of counsel upon payment of the $350 filing fee. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/6/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Vazquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mel Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Vazquez
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCG Sector San Diego
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?