Anticancer, Inc. v. Fujifilm Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anticancer, Inc.
Defendant: Fujifilm Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc, Fujifilm Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01311
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 101 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Fujifilm and GE Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. The Court Dismisses With Prejudice all claims in the Second Amended Complaint and the Court enters summary judgment of non-infringement in favor of Defendants Fujifilm and GE Healthcare. This judgment disposes of this action in its entirety as to all causes of action. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/11/2013. (srm)
March 7, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING re 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court tentatively rules: Defendants' motion for summary judgment of non-infringement is Granted. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/7/2013. (srm)
September 30, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: GE Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 45 ) is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/30/2010. (mdc)
January 19, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 27 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall strike Document Number 22 from the docket. GE Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 20 ) is granted. Plaintiff's claims against GE Healthcare, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend within thirty days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/19/2010. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anticancer, Inc. v. Fujifilm Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anticancer, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujifilm Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujifilm Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?