Johnson v. Gains et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: M Gains, S Holmstrom, J Beltran, J Palomera, M Carpio, B Smith, L Garza, B Rascon, Unknown, -, K Wood, D Edwards, M Perez, B C Reis, S Anderson, R Hopper, J Devenberg, J Magner, R Delgada, D Felix, C J Caffarell, T Ochoa, T Hughes, L Smalls, D Woodward, J V Garcia, N Grannis, J Rodriguez, J Builteman, R Madden, N Brown, ., J Criman, G J Janda, D Middleton, W J Price, M Ormand, R Phillips, M Stangle, R Fernandez and W Webb
Case Number: 3:2009cv01312
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2012 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 224 Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply with Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 7/13/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 23, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 184 Motion for Sanctions and granting in part plaintiff's 212 Motion for Reimbursement of Legal Fees. It is ordered Defendants through the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation are liable for $101.70 in costs to be paid to Plaintiff's prison account on or before April 20, 2012. The Court specifically finds NO discovery sanctions attributable to defense counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/23/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 7, 2012 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 199 as modified, and overruling Johnson's objections to the Report and Recommendation; denying Johnson's 66 , 69 Motions for Summary Judgment; denying Johnson's 208 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/6/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
January 18, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Discovery Conference and Imposing Sanctions 148 , 150 , 152 . Plaintiff's request for $200.00 in sanctions is hereby GRANTED. Defendants and Defendants' counsel are jointly and severally liable for $200.00 in sanc tions to be paid to Plaintiff's prison account on or before January 31, 2012. The parties have met and conferred on all outstanding discovery related issues. However, if further discovery disputes develop, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Honorable Louisa S Porter immediately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 1/18/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
October 24, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 100 Motion to Appoint Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
May 24, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 69 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 5/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 8, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Modified ORDER Granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint re 56 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr. Defendants are thereafter Ordered to reply to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/8/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 7, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 52 Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint; the Clerk of Court shall file plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint [52-1] as a new entry on the docket of the case; the Clerk shall issue a summons upon defe ndants as to plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint; defendants are ordered to reply to plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a); Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/7/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 24, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 50 Report and Recommendation, plaintiff's objections are overruled; plaintiff's motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint is referred to Magistrate Judge Porter for a report and recommendation; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
August 25, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 29 Motion to Intervene; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 29 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/25/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
March 12, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Third Amended Complaint. Defendants J Builteman, C J Caffarell, J Criman, R Delgada, J Devenberg, D Edwards, D Felix, R Fernandez, N Grannis, R Hopper, T Hughes, G J Janda, R Madden, J Magner, D Midd leton, T Ochoa, M Ormand, M Perez, R Phillips, W J Price, B C Reis, J Rodriguez, L Smalls, M Stangle, W Webb, K Wood, D Woodward, S Anderson, N Brown and "Unknown" defendant are dismissed from this action.Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/12/2010.(IFP package sent)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (kaj).
November 9, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel and Dismissing Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim: Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Third Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted in this order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/9/09. (Blank Third Amended 1983 Complaint sent with copy of Order)(pdc) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Gains et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wayne Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Gains
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Holmstrom
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Beltran
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Palomera
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Carpio
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Smith
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Garza
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Rascon
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Wood
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Edwards
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Perez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B C Reis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Anderson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hopper
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Devenberg
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Magner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Delgada
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Felix
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J Caffarell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Hughes
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Smalls
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Woodward
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J V Garcia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Grannis
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Rodriguez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Builteman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Madden
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Brown, .
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Criman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Middleton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W J Price
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ormand
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Phillips
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Stangle
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Fernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Webb
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?