Whitmore v. Hense
Petitioner: Paul Gordon Whitmore
Respondent: Lydia C. Hense
Case Number: 3:2009cv01324
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Adopting in its Entirety 60 Report and Recommendation; Overruling 67 Petitioner's Objections; Denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Denying 69 Motion for Relief Under Rule 60(b)(d) ; and Declining to Issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/12/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting 51 Report and Recommendation; Overruling Petitioner's Objections; and Denying 46 Motion to Include Previously Abandoned Grounds for Relief. Having reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the files and records herein, the Co urt adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Accordingly, the Court denies Petitioner's Motion to Reinstate Previously Abandoned Claims 5 and 6. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is stayed until 8/3/10. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner shall file a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in the appropriate state court and provide this Court with a copy of the petition that was filed in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecl)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/12/2009. (Jessen, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/19/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitmore v. Hense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Gordon Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lydia C. Hense
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?