Brecher et al v. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Brecher, Scott Short, Chad Taylor and Jennifer Murphy
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Inc., C. Michael Armstrong, Alain J.P. Belda, Kenneth T. Derr, John M. Deutch, Ann Dibble Jordan, Richard D. Parsons, Citigroup, Inc. Personnel and Compensation Committee and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01344
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Joint MOTION for Discovery Further Responses to 2nd Set of Interrogatories. As provided in the attached Order, Plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to Interrogatories 21 and 22 is denied and Plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to Interrogatory 23 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/15/13. (Dembin, Mitchell)
October 7, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 Joint MOTION for Discovery Determination of Discovery Dispute. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/7/13. (Dembin, Mitchell)
August 8, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and denying as moot 52 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs first and third causes of action are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Defendants Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) calendar days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 08/05/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (jrl).
March 29, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 14 Motion to Dismiss: To the extent Plaintiffs' claims are based on the theory that Defendants violated Cal. Lab. Code 16600, they are dismissed without leave to amend. Plaintiffs may, however, amend the first claim to s tate facts under an alternate theory. The remainder of the First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. No later than thirty calendar days from the date this Order is issued, Plaintiffs must either file a second am ended complaint, or an application for leave to amend and to add claims or parties. The Hines Declaration is hereby ordered stricken. Within seven calendar days of the date this Order is issued, Defendants shall file a notice of amendment to their motion to dismiss, attaching a redacted copy of the declaration that complies with Fed.R.Civ.P.52. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/29/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brecher et al v. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brecher
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Short
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Taylor
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Murphy
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie L Ronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Melanie L Ronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain J.P. Belda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Deutch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Dibble Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc. Personnel and Compensation Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?