Macias et al v. WMC Mortgage Corp et al

Plaintiff: Ruben Macias and Martha Macias
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corp, Chase Home Finance LLC and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2009cv01374
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Once the Joint Motion to Dismissal was filed, this action was dismissed automatically, without order of the Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). The (Doc. 35 ) Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint is not proper at this stage in the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/29/2010. (mdc)
January 6, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 13 , 15 ) are granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 21 ) is granted. No later than 45 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiffs fail to file a second amended complaint within forty-five days, the Court will order this case to be closed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/6/2010. (mdc)(jrl).
August 19, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 6 ) is denied as moot, and the Motion for the Motion to Dismiss to be Taken Off Calendar (Doc. 10 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/19/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macias et al v. WMC Mortgage Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Macias
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Macias
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?