Skylark Investment Properties, LLC v. Navigators Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Skylark Investment Properties, LLC
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company, NIC Insurance Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01435
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference on April 1, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara L.Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/11/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 7, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Susan Larsen terminated. Attorney Roman A. Kostenko added. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/6/2010. (tkl)
November 13, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/13/09. (tkl) (jrl).
September 15, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Rule 26 compliance and notice of Case Management Conference. On August 3, 2009, the Court vacated the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/15/09. (tkl) (jrl).
September 10, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/10/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skylark Investment Properties, LLC v. Navigators Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylark Investment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Susan Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIC Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?