Murphy et al v. Target Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Danyell Murphy
Defendant: Target Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01436
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magist rate Judge Stormes, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 09cv1436 WQH (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 03/28/14.(jcj)
July 12, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Discovery Issues: Plaintiff's request for production is granted consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/12/2011.(knh)
June 14, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Names and Contact Information of Putative Class Members. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 06/14/11. (cge)
December 9, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 27 Motion to Stay Action. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/9/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyell Murphy
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Claudette G Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?