Garibay v. American Home Mortgage Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Garibay
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Corp., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01460
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/2/10. (lao)(copy of Order mailed to counsel for Defendant American Home Mortgage Corp.)
March 26, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 17 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Wells Fargo. No later than 45 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, accompanied by a proposed second amended complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/26/2010. (mdc) (jrl).
November 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The action in this Court is stayed as to Defendant American Home Mortgage Corp. only. This action is not stayed as to Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants. Any opposition to the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5 ) must be file d no later than 12/4/2009. Any reply must be filed no later than 12/11/2009. There will be no oral argument on the Motion to Dismiss. Defendant American Home Mortgage Corp. is ordered to notify the Court in writing of any changes in the bankruptcy case relevant to this action. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/13/2009. (Per Order, mailed a copy of Order to Deft American Home Mortgage Corp.'s atty.) (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garibay v. American Home Mortgage Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Garibay
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?