Valueselling Associates, LLC et al v. Temple et al

Plaintiff: Valueselling Associates, LLC and Sales Vision, LLC
Defendant: Kevin Temple, Enterprise Selling Group and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01493
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 77 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Defendants' motion is granted as modified in footnote 2. Defendant shall recover $48,867.06. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/21/2011. (jah)
June 23, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 63 Motion to Confirm the Arbitration Award; denying Plaintiffs' 64 Motion to Vacate, Modify, or Correct the Arbitration Award; denying as moot Defendants' 66 Motion to Strike Motion to Vacate, Modify, or Correct Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/23/2011. (jah)
June 10, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 19 Motion for Attorney Fees as Modified. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 06/10/11. (cge)
November 6, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court hereby grants Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss the case (tkl)
November 5, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 defendants' Motion to Compel arbitration and dismiss the case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/5/09. (tkl)(av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valueselling Associates, LLC et al v. Temple et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valueselling Associates, LLC
Represented By: Todd Robert Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sales Vision, LLC
Represented By: Todd Robert Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Selling Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?