Ontiveros v. Harrington et al

Petitioner: Haron Ontiveros
Respondent: Kelly Harrington and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01503
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Petitioner's Application for Certificate of Appealability; and denying without prejudice 38 Petitioner's Request to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Petitioner's application for a certificate of appealability is DENIED; and 2. Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/26/2010. (USCA Case No. 10-56603. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
September 1, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling (Doc. 25 ) Petitioner's Objections; Adopting (Doc. 19 ) Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; Granting (Doc. 10 ) Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; and Dismissing the Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus as Unti mely. Petitioner's objections to the R&R are Overruled; The findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge presented in the R&R are Adopted in their entirety; Respondent's motion to dismiss the petition is Granted; The instant petition is Dismissed with prejudice as untimely; and Petitioner is Denied a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/1/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
February 4, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte substituting respondents, the Court hereby sua sponte ORDERS the substitution of Matthew Cate, Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, as Respondent in place of Kelly Harrington.Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/4/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)(mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontiveros v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Haron Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?