Ortega v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Plaintiff: Modesto Ortega
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, Primary Financial Services, LLC, First American Loanstar Trustee Services and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv01531
Filed: July 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Defendant Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss the intentional misrepresentation, fraudulent concealment, and TILA claims without leave to amend. Wells Fargo shall file an answer to Plaintiff's RESPA claim by June 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/11/2010. (tkl)
February 23, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/23/2010. The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendant Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss. The court DENIES Ortega's motion for leave to amend with the proposed second amended complaint filed with his opposition. However, the court GRANTS Ortega leave to amend his complaint. (tkl) (jrl).
January 25, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 leave to file late opposition no later than January 22, 2010. Defendants shall file any reply no later than January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/25/2010. (tkl)(jrl).
December 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 7 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/9/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto Ortega
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Loanstar Trustee Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?