Zaragoza v. Martel et al

Petitioner: Paul Zaragoza
Respondent: Mike Martel and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv01598
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Amador
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, (2) Granting request to Dismiss unexhausted claims and (3) Requiring Response re 14 , 17 , 19 . The Court adopts the recommendation to deny the motion for a stay and abeyance. The Court dismisses without prejudice Petitioner's first through third claims for relief. Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to the Petition, and a memorandum of points and authorities in support of such answer, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rul es Governing § 2254 Cases no later than May 19, 2011. At the time the answer is filed, Respondent shall lodge with the Court all records bearing on the merits of Petitioner's claim. The lodgments shall be accompanied by a notice of lodgment which shall be captioned "Notice of Lodgment in 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Habeas Corpus Case To Be Sent to Clerk's Office." Petitioner may file a Traverse no later than June 20, 2011. No traverse shall exceed ten (10) pages in length. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/19/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrd)
August 26, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Adopting In Part and Rejecting In Part (Doc. 12 ) Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, (2) Providing Options, and (3) Denying (Doc. 8 ) Respondent's Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice. Petitioner shall inform the Cour t of his decision to file a motion to stay by 9/27/2010. If Petitioner fails to respond to this Order, the Petition will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/26/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
December 4, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte substituting Respondent. The Court Orders the substitution of Matthew Cate, Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, as Respondent in place of "Michael Martel." Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaragoza v. Martel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Martel
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?