Batey Largo v. City of National City et al

Plaintiff: Omar Anthony Batey Largo
Defendant: City of National City, National City Police Department, Joshua Lineberg, Adolfo Gonzales and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01639
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The date and time of the Settlement Conference on December 20, 2010 at 9:00 am is vacated and reset for February 10, 2011 at 9:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/1/2010.(knh)
November 30, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Rule 56(f) Continuance. The pending motion for summary judgment is continued to January 24, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/30/2010. (knh)
September 22, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The date and time of the Settlement Conference on December 8, 2010 at 9:00 AM is vacated and reset for December 20, 2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/22/2010.(knh)
June 2, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER: The date and time of the Settlement Conference on June 14, 2010 at 9:00 AM is vacated and reset for August 11, 2010 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/2/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batey Largo v. City of National City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Anthony Batey Largo
Represented By: John T Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of National City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Lineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?