Williams v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jenifer Williams
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01669
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 116 Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute Determination and Staying PAGA-related Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/27/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
October 5, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 102 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Any discovery required by the attached Order must be produced within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/5/2011. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 2, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 76 ) Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff is denied. The (Doc. 77 ) Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/1/2011. (mdc)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenifer Williams
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?