MacMahon et al v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Elizondo, Michael Russell, Jose L. Leon, Jerrine Jordan, Lena De Jouday, Estrella A. Costales, Sandra G. Contreras, Magdalena Luna, Derrie MacMahon, Ronald Jordan, DOES 1-500, Manuel R. Contreras, Ozstar De Jourday, Javier Perez and Patricia Geib
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Inc. doing business as - Accubanc Mortgage formerly known as National City Bank, One West Bank, First American Corporation a California Corporation doing business as First American Loanstar Trustee Services, LLC, Washington Mutual Bank, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Loan Center of California, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, GMAC Mortgage, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Secured Bankers Mortgage Company, ETS Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Recontrust Company, Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Home EQ Servicing, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., National City Bank, Cal-Western Reconveyance Corpoartion, Fremont Investment and Loan, HSBC Bank USA, US Bank, U.S. Bank and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv01678
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' unopposed motions to dismiss are granted. The instant complaint is dismissed without prejudice against all Defendants. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/03/10.(jpp) (av1).
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting: #8 , #10 , #11 , #14 , Defendants' unopposed motions to dismiss. The instant complaint is dismissed without prejudice against all named Defendants. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/03/10.(jpp) (av1).
January 25, 2010 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Recontrust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement, #9 Supplemental Document, entitled Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice. (Cekirge, Nafiz) (jpp).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER vacating hearing date on #10 , #11 , #14 set for 01/25/10. Court deems the motions suitable for disposition without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/19/10.(jpp) (jrl).
January 19, 2010 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HSBC Bank USA, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., U.S. Bank re #23 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Mussig, Robert) (jpp).
January 19, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE by HSBC Bank USA, U.S. Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement NOTICE OF FAILURE BY PLAINTIFFS TO OPPOSE THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, AND HSBC BANK USA, N.A., AS TRUSTEE (Mussig, Robert) (jpp).
January 15, 2010 Filing 22 REPLY - Other re #10 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the alternative for a more defined statement filed by Washington Mutual Bank. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
January 15, 2010 Filing 21 REPLY - Other re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Reply to the Lack of Opposition From Plaintiffs to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint or, Alternatively, for a More Definite Statement filed by Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, US Bank. (Neff, Nicole) (jpp).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER vacating hearing date on #8 Defendants Motion to to Dismiss set for 12/21/09. Court deems the motion suitable for disposition without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/14/09. (jpp) (jrl).
December 14, 2009 Filing 19 NON Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Recontrust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Cekirge, Nafiz) (jpp).
November 24, 2009 Filing 18 Minute Order - It is hereby that Magistrate Judge Porter recuses from the case and orders that the case be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo added to the case. Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter is no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 09CV16748-JAH(WVG). (jpp) (jrl).
November 23, 2009 Filing 17 Minute Order: Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler recuses from this case and requests another Magistrate Judge be assigned. Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter has been randomly assigned to this case. The new case number is 09cv1678-JAH(POR)(jsp)
November 13, 2009 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice by Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Finlay, T). Modified on 11/16/09 to edit txt. (jpp).
November 12, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE by Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 11(a) to 13(c) to Request for Judicial Notice)(Finlay, T) (jpp).
November 12, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank. (Finlay, T) (jpp).
November 9, 2009 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Non-Monetary Status by Defendant First American Corporation. (Finlay, T) (jpp).
October 29, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D Vogel on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, U.S. Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Vogel, Edward) (jpp).
October 29, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement by HSBC Bank USA, U.S. Bank, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Mussig, Robert) (jpp).
October 14, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the alternative for a more defined statement by Washington Mutual Bank. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
October 8, 2009 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Recontrust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement entitled REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. (Cekirge, Nafiz) (jpp).
October 8, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative,, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Recontrust Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Cekirge, Nafiz) (jpp).
October 8, 2009 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Recontrust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Recontrust Company; Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank N.A... (Cekirge, Nafiz) (jpp).
September 11, 2009 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Washington Mutual Bank, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., PNC Financial Services Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corpoartion, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., First American Corporation, U.S. Bank, Loan Center of California, HSBC Bank USA, Fremont Investment and Loan, Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., ETS Services, LLC, US Bank, One West Bank, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation, Recontrust Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed by Jerrine Jordan, Michael Russell, Manuel R. Contreras, Sandra G. Contreras, Estrella A. Costales, Derrie MacMahon, Jose L. Leon, Javier Perez, DOES, Ozstar De Jourday, Lena De Jouday, Patricia Geib, Magdalena Luna, Manuel Elizondo, Ronald Jordan.(Gordon, Chance) (jpp).
September 10, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re #4 Amended Complaint, (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(ag)
September 10, 2009 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants, filed by Manuel R. Contreras, Sandra G. Contreras, Estrella A. Costales, Derrie MacMahon, Jose L. Leon, Javier Perez, Ozstar De Jourday, Lena De Jouday, Patricia Geib, Magdalena Luna, Manuel Elizondo.(ag)
August 5, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (cap)
August 5, 2009 Filing 2 Minute Entry: Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to case and Judge John A. Houston is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 09-CV-1678 JAH (JMA); (ag) (jrl).
August 4, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Washington Mutual Bank, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., PNC Financial Services Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corpoartion, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., First American Corporation, U.S. Bank, Loan Center of California, HSBC Bank USA, Fremont Investment and Loan, Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc., ETS Services, LLC, US Bank, One West Bank, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation, and DOES ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number CAS3888.), filed by Jerrine Jordan, Michael Russell, Manuel R. Contreras, Sandra G. Contreras, Estrella A. Costales, Derrie MacMahon, Jose L. Leon, Javier Perez, Ozstar De Jourday, Lena De Jouday, Manuel Elizondo, and Ronald Jordan.(jer) [atty maint] (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacMahon et al v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Inc. doing business as - Accubanc Mortgage formerly known as National City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Corporation a California Corporation doing business as First American Loanstar Trustee Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Center of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Secured Bankers Mortgage Company
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel
Represented By: Robert E. Mussig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay's Capital Real Estate, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Home EQ Servicing
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corpoartion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Investment and Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel
Represented By: Robert E. Mussig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel
Represented By: Robert E. Mussig, Jr.
Represented By: T Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Elizondo
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Russell
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Leon
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrine Jordan
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena De Jouday
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrella A. Costales
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra G. Contreras
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Luna
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrie MacMahon
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jordan
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOES 1-500
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel R. Contreras
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozstar De Jourday
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Perez
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Geib
Represented By: Chance E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?