Espinoza et al v. Recontrust Company, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Espinoza and Maribel Guardado
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Ditech Home Financing, Greenlight Financial Services, GMAC Mortgage, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01687
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Greenlight Financial Service's 37 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Dft Greenlight are dismissed w/ prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against Dfts Reconstrust, N.A. and Countrywide Financial Services are dismissed w/o prejudice. If Plaintiffs wish to continue w/ this case, within 30 calendar days of date this Order is issued, they must either substitute in another atty as counsel or file notice of intent to proceed pro se. Clerk directed to send copy of this Order to Plaintiffs' counsel at address provided in the docket and to Plaintiffs at the address of the Property. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/19/2010. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiffs to property address) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
July 13, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Ditech Home Financing and GMAC Martgage LLC's 29 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Court grants motion to dismiss in its entirety with respect to Defendant GMAC and dismisses with prejudice GMAC from the act ion. The third cause of action against Ditech is dismissed w/ leave to amend to extent it alleges RESPA violation and dismissed w/ prejudice to extent it alleges a cause of action for accounting. The fourth cause of action for quiet title is dismisse d w/ prejudice as to Ditech. If Plaintiffs wish to file an amended complaint, they should do so within 21 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/13/2010. (jah). Modified on 7/14/2010 - Corrected spelling and text. Regenerated NEF (jah).
April 19, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 18 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Court orders Plaintiffs to file their second amended complaint w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/19/2010. (jah)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza et al v. Recontrust Company, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Espinoza
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Guardado
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Home Financing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlight Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?