Steel v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: John F Steel, IV
Defendant: City of San Diego, San Diego Police Department, William Lansdowne, Michael McCollough, Daniel Douglas, Gilbert Ninness, Confidential Research Company, Laura Marie Sisson-Brown, Rick Bronold, Luis Gonzalez, Charles E Jones, Hervey and Wood, A.P.C., Robert Wood, Stocks and Fentin, Janis Kay Stocks, Susan Hasbrouck, Aaron Zigman and DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv01743
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Lifting Stay; (2) Granting City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Cause of Action. Plaintiff was convicted on one count of driving under the influence of alcohol on 6/22/2010. (Doc. 130 ) Accordingly, the Court now Lifts the stay in this matter. Plaintiff asserts in his first cause of action that he was falsely arrested and imprisoned for driving under the influence of alcohol. Plaintiff's claim, if ultimately successful, would necessarily imply the invali dity of the Plaintiff's recent conviction. Accordingly, the Court Dismisses Plaintiff's first cause of action for unlawful seizure and imprisonment in its entirety with prejudice. Defendants shall file their answers to the Second Amended Complaint within 20 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/25/2010.(leh)
June 30, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 88 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 90 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 90 Motion to Strike; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 91 Motion to Dismiss; and Granting 101 Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby o rders that: (1) The City Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 90) is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent the Court dismisses any claim against the City Defendants, the Court does so without leave to amend. (2) The City Defendants� 39; Motion to Strike (Doc. 90) is Denied. (3) The Attorney Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 88) is Granted in its entirety without leave to amend. The Court Dismisses Defendants Janis KayStocks and Robert Wood with prejudice. (4) The Investig ator Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 91) is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent the Court dismisses any claim against the Investigator Defendants, the Court does so without leave to amend. In light of the foregoing, the Court further Orders Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by 7/23/2010. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/30/2010. (leh) (jrl).
November 5, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Charles E. Jones. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants Jones's motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is ordered to terminate Jones as a defendant to this action. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/5/2009. (leh)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steel v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Steel, IV
Represented By: Richard Scott deSaulles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lansdowne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Ninness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confidential Research Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Marie Sisson-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Bronold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hervey and Wood, A.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stocks and Fentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Kay Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Zigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?