Lino v. Small et al

Plaintiff: Owen Lino
Defendant: L Small, T Ochoa, C Butler, J Mitchell, M Vorise, R Powell, O Rashad, John Doe #1 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 3:2009cv01834
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 137 Request for Certificate of Appealability; denying 136 Request to Reopen the Time for Appeal; denying 138 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Here, there are no valid grounds on which an appeal can be based. Consequently, the Court certifies that any appeal taken from the Court's August 24 and September 28 Orders will not be taken in good faith and is therefore frivolous. The Clerk of Court shall notify the Court of Appeals of this order. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the Court of Appeals within thirty days after service of notice of this Order. Any such motion "must include a copy of the affidavit filed in the district court and the distri ct court's statement of reasons for its action." Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/13/2012. (USCA Case Number 12-57047. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
September 19, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting 72 Report and Recommendation; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 63 Motion to Dismiss; and Denying as Moot 74 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall have 21 days to file a Fourth Amended Complaint that properly names Defendant Powell and is otherwise consistent with the terms and conditions set forth by this order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 5, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting in its Entirety 31 Report and Recommendations; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 15 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendations in its entirety and grants in part and denies in part Defendant s' motion to dismiss. Specifically, Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims regarding the Halal diet and cleaning supplies for religious purposes is Granted; Defendants' motion with respect to Plaintiff's claims seek ing access to a copy of the Quran, group prayer time, information from the Imam regarding the proper time to pray, a prayer rug, and prayer oil is Denied. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/5/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lino v. Small et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Lino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vorise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Rashad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?