Dancesport Videos, LLC et al v. Ediza Online, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dancesport Videos, LLC. and Digital Video Creations, Inc.
Defendant: Ediza Online, Inc., As Seen On TV Infomercials, Inc., Frank Bianco, Frank Bianco, Inc., Sharewell Group, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv01873
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/18/09. (pdc) (jrl).
September 3, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Unseal Case. The file in this case is ordered unsealed. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/3/2009. (jah). Modified on 9/3/2009 - NEF generated, case unsealed (jah).
August 28, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 5 Motion for Seizure of Goods; denying w/o prejudice Plaintiffs' 5 Motion for Expedited Discovery. USMS prior ro 8/31/2009 shall conduct reasonable search for and impound any and all goods, including packaged and unpackaged DVDs' bearing any imitations of the federally registered CORE RHYTHMS trademarks of Dancesport. USMS shall serve a copy of this Order, Summons, Complaint anf Application for Ex Parte Order of Seizure of Counterfeit upon the Dfts. Plaintiffs shall post a cash deposit w/ Clerk in lieu of a bond in the total amount of $2500.00, or in the alternative an undertaking in that amount. Hearing on Plaintiffs; Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 9/1/2009 11:00am in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry A. Burns. Dfts shall opposition to the motiojn by 8/31/2009.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/28/2009. (cc: USMS) (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dancesport Videos, LLC et al v. Ediza Online, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dancesport Videos, LLC.
Represented By: Gregory J Sater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Video Creations, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Sater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ediza Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: As Seen On TV Infomercials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Bianco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharewell Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?