Jones v. Cate

Petitioner: Christopher Jones
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01896
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, as Modified; Denying Objections; Issuing a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/25/2013.(knb)
July 26, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 50 Report and Recommendation in its entirety. In sum, the R & R is adopted in its entirety and 38 Motion to Amend is denied without prejudice, and 23 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/26/2011. (leh)
July 12, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION in their entirety and this Court denies Respondent's motion to dismiss, with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/12/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
September 29, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 without prejudice Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/29/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?