Sanchez v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lourdes Sanchez
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Bank of America Home Loans, Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Coastal Empire Mortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02005
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 63 Report and Recommendation: the court adopts the R&R in its entirety and dismisses this action without prejudice as to all parties. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/6/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
May 10, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The court grants in part and denies in part Ocwen and RWPO's motion to dismiss without leave to amend. The court grants GreenPoint's motion to dismiss without leave to amend. The court grants Ocwen and RWPO's motion to expunge the lis pendens. Ocwen shall file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint no later than June 4, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/10/2010. (tkl)
March 4, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATED per 32 .ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Ocwen and RWPO's Motion to Dismiss. The court GRANTS GreenPoint's motion to dismiss 20 . The court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint 22 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/4/2010. (tkl) (kaj). Modified text on 3/8/2010 (tkl).
January 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/7/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
November 30, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 joint Motion for Extension of Time to 1/11/2010 for Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/24/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Sanchez
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Empire Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?