Shedd v. Neotti et al

Petitioner: Herbert Shedd
Respondent: George A Neotti and Jerry Brown
Case Number: 3:2009cv02065
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER (1) ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and (2) denying Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Certificate of Appealability denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/1/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
January 31, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court TO BE AMENDED PER CHAMBERS - ORDER (1) ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and (2) denying Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: This Order concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) Modified to add text on 1/31/2011 (lmt).
September 24, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Setting Briefing Schedule to Petition (28 USC 2254). Respondent shall file a Motion to Dismiss by 11/9/2009. If Motion to Dismiss is filed, Petitioner shall file Opposition to Motion by 11/30/2009 OR Answer by Respondent due by 11/23/2009. Petitioner may file a Traverse by 12/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/24/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shedd v. Neotti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herbert Shedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George A Neotti
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?