Gonzalez et al v. Millard Mall Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Gonzalez and Norma Lopez Juan
Defendant: Millard Mall Services, Inc., The Millard Group and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02076
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 95 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the PAGA claim in the seventh cause of action. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/21/12. (cge)
March 6, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/6/12. (cge)
March 2, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 48 Motion for Class Certification; and grants Plaintiffs' and Defendants' requests for judicial notice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/28/12. (cge)
September 22, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 42 Joint Statement of Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/22/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
April 7, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 16 ) Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings And Granting (Doc. 18 ) Request To File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/6/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration notice also sent to Atty Brent M. Giddens.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Millard Mall Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Gonzalez
Represented By: Justian Jusuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Lopez Juan
Represented By: Justian Jusuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Mall Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicky Jatana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Millard Group
Represented By: Nicky Jatana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?