Ton v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Plaintiff: Sopheay Ton
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2009cv02276
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute is granted with prejudice(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 4, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/4/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
December 10, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/10/09. The motion to dismiss 6 is granted with 30 days leave to amend from the date of entry of this order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to file an amended complaint will likely result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ton v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sopheay Ton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Edward D Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?