Patterson v. County of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Gene Patterson
Defendant: County of San Diego, State of California, UCSD Hospital, Alvarado Hospital and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv02298
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Alvarado Hospital's 49 Motion to Dismiss with Respect to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part County of San Diego's 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting UCSD Hospital's 51 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Pla's claims against County of San Diego for violation of the 1st, 4th, and 14th Amendments, for violation of due process under the 5th Amendment, for violation of the 8th Amendment based upo n jail officials failure to timely respond or provide adequate medical care are dismissed w/ prejudice. Pla's claim against County under 42 USC 1985 is dismissed w/ prejudice. County of San Diego shall file an answer w/in 10 days of the filing o f this Order. Pla's claims against Alvarado Hospital and The Regents of the University of California are dismissed with prejudice. Court dismisses Pla's claims against the State of California, Greg Cox, Diane Jacobs, Pam Slater-Price, Ron R oberts, Bill Horn, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Alexander Schwartz M.D., William J. Peace M.D., Tudor Hughes M.D., Lisa Lowe M.D., J. Gondusky M.D., Robert Meyer M.D., Reid Abrams M.D., and Terance Davidson M.D. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/25/2011. (jah)
October 8, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant County of San Diego's 33 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court GRANTS the County's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
July 21, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Alvarado Hospital's 4 Motion to Dismiss; granting Defendant County of San Diego's 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting Defendant Regents of the University of California's 13 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Quash. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file amended complaint within 21 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/21/2010. Case closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Patterson
Represented By: Clifton D Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCSD Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvarado Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?