Tri-City Healthcare District v. HC Tri-City I, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tri-City Healthcare District
Defendant: HC Tri-City I, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02334
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 95 Defendant HC Tri-City I, LLC's Motion for Attorney Fees; (2) Granting 112 Plaintiff Tri-City Healthcare District Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs. The Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, (ECF No. 110 ), is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/17/2014. (srm)
December 21, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Claims For Declaratory Relief; (2) Terminating 09-cv-2334; (3) Denying Motion To Dismiss As Moot; (4) Setting Pretrial Conference: The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE the 2334 case. The pending motion to dismiss in the 2334 case, (2334 ECF No. 78), is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/21/2012. (mdc)
September 18, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/18/2012. (jao)
December 13, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend to Delete its Second Cause of Action; denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of its First Claim; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss Larry Anderson: Following entry of t his Order, Tri-City SHALL FILE a Second Amended Complaint containing only its first claim for declaratory relief, identical to its First Amended Complaint except without the second claim. This is the sole remaining claim in the related case. In the l ead case, only Hammes's first claim for breach of the letter of intent against Tri-City remains. The parties SHALL APPEAR at the final pretrial conference currently set for 1/26/12 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6. Opposition to HC's motion for summary judgment is due by 1/9/2012 and reply due by 1/16/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/13/11. (lmt)
August 4, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file its First Amended Complaint within 7 calendar days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/4/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-City Healthcare District v. HC Tri-City I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-City Healthcare District
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HC Tri-City I, LLC
Represented By: J. David Bournazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?