Stiller et al v. Costco et al

Plaintiff: Mary Pytelewski
Defendant: Costco, Wireless Advocates, LLC and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02473
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2015 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 255 Motion to Intervene; Vacating Hearing Date Set for April 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 1, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 232 Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify; (2) Vacating Hearing Date. The hearing set for October 3, 2014 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/1/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
April 15, 2014 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 146 Costco's Motion to Decertify Class and Collective Actions. Both the California Class and the FLSA Class are Decertified. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/15/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
September 26, 2013 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 160 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint and to Modify Class Definition. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Amended Complaint, currently set for September 27, 2013, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/26/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm) (jrl).
August 15, 2013 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence (Docs. 181 , 200 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
February 14, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Proposed Notices to Classes. The Court directs the parties to confer and re-submit their joint proposed notices with the required language as to the California (Rule 23) class, or advise the Court through briefing as to why the required statements should not be included on or before February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/14/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiller et al v. Costco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pytelewski
Represented By: Jill M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco
Represented By: David D Kadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wireless Advocates, LLC
Represented By: Laura L Saadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?