Gerth et al v. American Mortgage Express Financial et al

Plaintiff: Robert Gerth and Judith Gerth
Defendant: American Mortgage Express Financial, Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Regional Services Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02475
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave To Amend. Defendants Bank of America, N.A, Mortgage Electronic Registrations System, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Federal National Mortgage Association, Landsafe, Inc. and Reconstruct Company, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss is Granted With Leave To Amend (Doc. 58 ). No later than April 4, 2011 Plaintiffs must file either an amended complaint, or a notice of election not to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2011. (srm)
July 12, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 44 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint: Because the parties do not address the applicable standard, their joint motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/12/2010. (mjj)
November 6, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/6/2009. (mjj)(jrl).
November 5, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Plaintiffs failed to make a sufficient showing of their likelihood of success on the merits and the possibility of imminent irreparable harm. Their motion for a TRO is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/5/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerth et al v. American Mortgage Express Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gerth
Represented By: Shannon E. Oltarzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gerth
Represented By: Shannon E. Oltarzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Express Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?