Cameron v. Buether et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Cameron
Defendant: David Buether, Michelle Craig, County of San Diego and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02498
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Michelle Craig and County of San Diego's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/4/2011. (jah)
June 29, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants County and Craig's motion to dismiss plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint as to the second cause of action for negligence 39 . Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/29/10. (kaj) (jrl).
March 23, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part Plaintiff's 19 Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint. Court orders Pla to file a Third Amended Complaint w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/23/2010. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Buether et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cameron
Represented By: Alex B Scheingross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Buether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?