Lute v. California Dept of Corrections

Petitioner: Arthur Fredrick Lute, III
Respondent: California Dept of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2009cv02501
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of California Dept of Corrections, George Neotti against Arthur Fredrick Lute, III. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Petitioners request to proceed in forma pauperis and dismisses this action without prejudice because Petitioner has failed to allege exhaustion of state judicial remedies. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 15, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing petition without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (av1).
November 12, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. To have this case reopened, Petitioner must, no later than January 11, 2010, pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee, and file a First Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Amended 2254 Petition and IFP form sent to Petitioner)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lute v. California Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Fredrick Lute, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Dept of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?