Coreno v. Armstrong et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Coreno
Defendant: Marc Armstrong, Hunt, R Hilis, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Doe #7, John Doe #8, Jane Doe #9, John Doe #10, John Doe #11 and John Doe #12
Case Number: 3:2009cv02504
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 50 . The motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust is granted, but with leave to amend. The motion to dismiss Coreno's First Amendment claim for failure to state a legally cognizable claim is denied, but the motion to dismiss the claim for failure to exhaust is granted, with leave to amend. The motion to dismiss Coreno's First Amendment access to the courts claim for failure to state a legally cognizable claim is granted without prejudice. The m otion to dismiss Coreno's Fourteenth Amendment claim for failure to state a legally cognizable claim is granted, but without prejudice and with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/29/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
June 14, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's 22 Motion for Relief from Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 6/14/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
May 19, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 5/19/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(pdc) (jrl).
November 18, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Order Dismissing Civil Action for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b): The Secretary of the CDCR is orde red to collect the $33.14 initial partial filing fee assessed by this Order and forward that amount to the Clerk of Court, if those funds are available at the time this Order is executed. The Secretary of the CDCR is also ordered to collect fro m Plaintiff's prison trust account the balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income cre dited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10. Plaintiff is granted sixty (60) days leave from the date this Order is filed in which to file a First Amended Complaint which c ures all the deficiencies of pleading noted in this order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/18/09. (Blank First Amended Complaint and copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff, Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR)(pdc) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coreno v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Coreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hilis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?