Dowell v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Donald Dowell
Defendant: W T Griffin, M Botkin, M Zdunich, Iversen, L Johnson, S Adams, Catherine Mellett, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, City of San Diego and William Lansdowne
Case Number: 3:2009cv02576
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.56(c). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 49 is Granted as to Defendants Johnson, Iverson, Adams and Millett and Denied as to Defendants Botkin, Zdunich and Griffin. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/8/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 17, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion for discovery of personnel files re 46 . Defendants are ordered to produce the properly redacted document, designated TG-IA-2008-105-0001-256, pursuant to the protective order in place in the above entitled matter no later than five (5) court days following the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/17/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
July 11, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re 37 , 58 . Defendants are Ordered to respond to all unanswered interrogatories, and to provide additional responses. Defendants must provide responses no later than August 8, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/11/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 10, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no initial partial filing fee and garnishing $350.00 balance from Inmates's Trust Account; and (2) Dismissing action without prejudice for failing to state a claim pursuan t to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b). Plaintiff is Granted forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/10/09. (copy of Order sent to Matthew Cate)(1983 Complaint form mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowell v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W T Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Zdunich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Mellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lansdowne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?