Kelson v. The Attorney General of the State of California

Petitioner: Brenda Lee Kelson
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak and The Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2009cv02629
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Madera
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The court grants Respondents' motion to dismiss the petition with prejudice and denies Petitioner's motion to toll time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/28/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
March 26, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 4 Petitioner's Request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
January 21, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 application to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/21/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelson v. The Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brenda Lee Kelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?