Maxwell v. Walker

Petitioner: Clifton Maxwell
Respondent: James Walker, The Attorney General of the State of California, George A Neotti and Edmund G Brown, Jr
Case Number: 3:2009cv02660
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 16 Report and Recommendations and Granting 15 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: IT IS ORDERED adopting the Report and Recommendation in its entirety and granting respondents motion to dismiss the first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
December 4, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice and With Leave to Amend: To have this case reopened, Petitioner must file a First Amended Petition no later than January 21, 2010 which cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail Petitioner a blank First Amended Petition form together with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/4/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Order and First Amended Petition form mailed to Petitioner via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj) (kaj).
November 24, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/23/09 CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California. (Plummer, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/24/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifton Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Walker
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George A Neotti
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?