Wright v. General Motors Acceptance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Roderick Wright
Defendant: General Motors Acceptance Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02666
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 98 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/5/2012. (knb)(jrd)
April 23, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 85 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/23/2012. (knb)
January 25, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff fails to establish that he has standing under Proposition 64 to pursue his UCL claim, Court grants summary judgment in favor of GMAC and against Plaintiff, and dismisses the claim. Clerk instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/25/2012. (jah)
January 14, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 joint Motion to Continue ENE to February 23, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/14/2010. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. General Motors Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Wright
Represented By: Michael E Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?