Willard v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Donna J Willard
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv02689
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER OF REMAND; granting 19 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Late Objections to the R&R by Michael J Astrue; Defendant's objections are sustained in part and overruled in part; the Court modified the R&R to include its reasoning and adopts the R&R as modified; this matter is remanded to the ALJ with instructions to reconsider Plaintiff's claim; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/26/11 (cc: Social Security)(kaj)
December 10, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in Part Report and Recommendation Re 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis: Because the Report and Recommendation favors Plaintiff, she has no reason to object, and Defendant has not yet been served and so has no opportunity to object. The Court therefore rejects that portion of the Report and Recommendation that provides for an objection period and adopts the remainder as its ruling. As set forth in the Report and Recommendation, Plaintiff's IFP Application is grante d. The United States Marshals shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff on U.S. Marshal Form 285. Defendant shall reply to the complaint within the applicable provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a) and 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/9/09. (IFP package prepared) (pdc) Modified to indicate IFP package prepared (pdc). (jrl).
December 8, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be granted. No later than December 22, 2009, any party to this action may file a written objection with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than January 5, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/8/09. (pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willard v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J Willard
Represented By: Thomas Garrett Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?